MS SB2990 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The City Of Flowood, Mississippi, To Levy A Tax On The Gross Proceeds Of Sales Of Room Rentals Of Hotel And Motel Rooms In The City; To Authorize The City To Issue Bonds In An Amount Not To Exceed $20,000,000.00 For The Purpose Of Financing A Conference Center And Related And Ancillary Facilities; And For Related Purposes.
Title
City of Flowood; authorize a tax on hotels & motels; authorize the issuance of bonds for a conference center.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 21 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-19 | House | Passed |
2014-03-14 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-13 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |