MS SB2981 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Kemper County, Mississippi, To Create And Participate In The Kemper County Natural Gas District; To Establish A Board Of Commissioners Of The District; To Provide For The Membership And Terms Of Office For The Commission's Board Of Directors; To Authorize The Commission To Construct And Operate A Natural Gas Transmission And Distribution System And To Prescribe Other Powers And Duties Of The Commission; To Authorize The Issuance Of Revenue Bonds To Construct The Natural Gas Transmission And Distribution System; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Kemper County; authorize creation of the Kemper County Natural Gas District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-29 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-28 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-03-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-28 | House | Amended |
2014-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |