MS SB2961 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-3-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Elements Of The Offense Of Stalking And Aggravated Stalking; To Enact Definitions; To Clarify And Revise Terms Of Punishment; To Clarify Venue For Prosecution Of The Offense; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Stalking; revise elements of offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Died On Calendar | |
2010-03-08 | Tabled Subject To Call | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-16 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-11 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |