MS SB2919 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Chapter 991, Local And Private Laws Of 1997, As Last Amended By Chapter 929, Local And Private Laws Of 2014, To Extend The Date Of Repeal To October 1, 2021, On The Law That Establishes The Lauderdale County Tourism Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Lauderdale County; extend repeal date on the Lauderdale County Tourism Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-16 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | House | Passed |
2017-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |