MS SB2901 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Landowners Protection Act; To Regulate Liability Of Landowners When An Invitee Is Injured On The Landowner's Property; To Amend Section 85-5-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "fault" Regarding Joint And Several Liability; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landowners Protection Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 78 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 74 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-25HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-22SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-05HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-04HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-02-28HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Banks, Baker, Tullos)
2019-02-28HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-28HouseAmended
2019-02-28HouseReconsidered
2019-02-25HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Baker, Tullos)
2019-02-25HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-25HouseAmended
2019-02-21HouseRead the Third Time
2019-02-19HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Judiciary A
2019-02-11SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-02-07SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2019-02-07SenatePassed
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-01SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Business and Financial Institutions

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2901.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2901IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2901CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2901PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2900-2999/SB2901SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2901_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2901_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2901_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2901_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2901_H_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2901_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2901_H_Amend_02_to_Amend_02.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0310040.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0350008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0490002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0520003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0710028.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback