MS SB2893 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Donate Certain Submerged Lands Located In Jackson County, Mississippi, To The National Park Service; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Secretary of State; authorize to donate certain property in Jackson County, Mississippi, to the National Park Service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |