MS SB2892 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-13-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend The Definition Of A Community Hospital Service Area To Include Areas Outside Of The State; To Amend Section 41-13-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That When An Owner Of A Community Hospital Wishes To Sell The Hospital Or Lease The Hospital With An Option To Sell It, A Petition Requesting An Election On The Question Of Whether The Owner Should Proceed With The Process Of Seeking Proposals For The Sale Or Lease Of The Hospital May Be Filed With The Clerk Of The Owner; To Provide That If Less Than A Majority Of The Voters In The Election Vote In Favor Of The Question, Then The Owner Is Not Authorized To Sell Or Lease The Hospital; To Provide That If A Majority Of The Voters In The Election Vote In Favor Of The Question, Or If No Such Petition Requesting An Election Is Timely Filed With The Clerk, Then The Owner May Seek Proposals For The Sale Or Lease Of The Hospital And May Sell Or Lease The Hospital To The Respondent Submitting The Highest And Best Proposal After Publishing Notice; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community hospitals; revise provisions regarding service area and proposed sale of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 79 N: 28 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-12 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-11 | House | Amended |
2019-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |