MS SB2889 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Capitol Region Utility Act; To Establish The Mississippi Capitol Region Utility Authority; To Provide For The Appointment Of A President And A Board Of Directors For Such Authority; To Clarify The Powers And Duties Of Such Board; To Ensure Access To Safe, Clean And Reliable Water For The Citizens Of Central Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Capitol Region Utility Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | House | Died On Calendar |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development |