MS SB2838 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Tourism Reorganization Act"; To Create The Mississippi Department Of Tourism; To Create The State Board Of Tourism And Provide For Its Membership; To Require The State Board Of Tourism To Appoint An Executive Director Of The Department Of Tourism; To Prescribe The General Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Tourism And The Executive Director; To Authorize The Department Of Tourism To Establish A Program Of Grants To Be Matched By Tourism Entities In The State; To Provide For The Transfer Of Powers And Duties Of State Agencies Relating To Tourism To The Department Of Tourism; To Authorize The Department Of Tourism To Sell Advertising And Other Tourism Promotional Information And To Create The Mississippi Department Of Tourism Advertising Fund; To Create The Mississippi Tourism Association Marketing Advisory Board To Assist The Department Of Tourism; To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Divert A Portion Of Sales Tax Revenue Collected From Restaurants And Hotels Into The Department Of Tourism Advertising Fund Instead Of The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides General Powers And Duties Of The Mississippi Development Authority With Respect To Tourism; To Repeal Section 57-1-60, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Department Of Economic And Community Development To Establish A Program Of Grants To Finance, Promote And Advertise Local Tourist Attractions; To Repeal Section 57-1-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Transfer Of Functions Of The Travel And Tourism Division Of The Agricultural And Industrial Board To The Department Of Economic Development; To Repeal Section 57-1-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Transfer Of Powers And Duties Of State Agencies Relating To Tourism To The Mississippi Development Authority; To Repeal Section 57-1-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Mississippi Development Authority To Sell Advertising And Other Tourism Information And Creates The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-64.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Tourism Association Marketing Advisory Board To Assist The Mississippi Development Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Tourism; create.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To TO |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TO To AP |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Tourism;Appropriations |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |