MS SB2820 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Tourism Reorganization Act"; To Create The Mississippi Department Of Tourism; To Require The Governor To Appoint, With The Advice And Consent Of The Senate, An Executive Director Of The Department Of Tourism; To Prescribe The General Powers And Duties Of The Department Of Tourism And The Executive Director; To Authorize The Department Of Tourism To Establish A Program Of Grants To Be Matched By Tourism Entities In The State; To Authorize The Department Of Tourism To Sell Advertising And Other Tourism Promotional Information And To Create The Mississippi Department Of Tourism Advertising Fund; To Create The Mississippi Tourism Association Marketing Advisory Board To Assist The Department Of Tourism; To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Divert A Portion Of Sales Tax Revenue Collected From Restaurants And Hotels Into The Department Of Tourism Advertising Fund Instead Of The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides General Powers And Duties Of The Mississippi Development Authority With Respect To Tourism; To Repeal Section 57-1-60, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Department Of Economic And Community Development To Establish A Program Of Grants To Finance, Promote And Advertise Local Tourist Attractions; To Repeal Section 57-1-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Transfer Of Functions Of The Travel And Tourism Division Of The Agricultural And Industrial Board To The Department Of Economic Development; To Repeal Section 57-1-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Transfer Of Powers And Duties Of State Agencies Relating To Tourism To The Mississippi Development Authority; To Repeal Section 57-1-64, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Authorizes The Mississippi Development Authority To Sell Advertising And Other Tourism Information And Creates The Mississippi Development Authority Tourism Advertising Fund; To Repeal Section 57-1-64.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Mississippi Tourism Association Marketing Advisory Board To Assist The Mississippi Development Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Tourism; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred To Tourism |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 65 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 59 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 60 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 61 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 63 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 1 | 64 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |