MS SB2818 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-895, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Prohibition On Electioneering Activities To All Persons Within The Polling Place And In Any Public Area That Is Within 150 Feet Of The Polling Place; To Define The Activities Which Constitute Electioneering; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electioneering; prohibit for all persons in any public area within 150 feet of polling place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Died In Conference |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Denny,Cockerham,Beckett |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Blackwell,Chassaniol,Fillingane |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2019-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Elections |