MS SB2793 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Exemption For Attorney Services With Regard To Oversight By The Public Procurement Review Board; To Amend Section 7-5-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Attorney General To Disapprove Any Contract For Outside Counsel That Contains Nonlegal Services If The Additional Services Fall Under The Purview Of The Public Procurement Review Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legal service contracts; clarify exemption from Public Procurement Review Board.
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Charles Younger [R] | Sen. Chad Mcmahan [R] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 104 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
7 | 5 | 39 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |