MS SB2792 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 73-77-5, 73-77-7 And 73-77-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Certain Provisions Of The Fresh Start Act Of 2019 Shall Apply Notwithstanding Any Other Provision Of Law; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fresh Start Act of 2019; expand.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09HouseDied On Calendar
2021-03-09HouseRuled Improperly Before House
2021-03-09HousePoint of Order - Well Taken
2021-03-09HousePoint of Order Raised
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-26HouseReferred To Judiciary B
2021-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-11SenatePassed
2021-01-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-27SenateDR - TSDP: LA To JA
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Labor;Judiciary, Division A

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
73775Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73777Amended CodeSee Bill Text
73779Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback