MS SB2785 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Air Service Development Program Act; To Provide Grants To Certain Airports To Promote Additional Commercial Air Service In The State; To Provide How Grant Funds May Be Utilized; To Require The Mississippi Development Authority To Administer The Program; To Provide Certain Disbursements To Airport Grant Recipients; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Air Service Development Program Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-11 | House | Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-03-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To PO |
2014-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PO To AP |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports;Appropriations |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Finance |