MS SB2777 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on February 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-13-89, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Minimum Base Salary For School Attendance Officers; To Set A Salary Scale For School Attendance Officers; To Amend Section 37-3-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Limitation On The Salary Of The State Superintendent Of Public Education; To Amend Section 37-4-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Limitation On The Salary Of The Executive Director Of The Community College Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School attendance officers; revise to increase the minimum base salary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 13 | 89 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 3 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |