MS SB2774 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-239, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Payment For Online Training For Certified Poll Managers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Certified poll managers; clarify payments for online training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | House | Died On Calendar |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To AE |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDP: AE To AP |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections;Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-25 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EL To AP |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Appropriations |