MS SB2766 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-7-12, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The State Board Of Cosmetology Shall Conduct Student Examinations Instead Of Contracting With A Testing Service; To Prohibit The Members Of The Board From Personally Administering Or Monitoring The Examinations, And Direct The Board To Contract For Administrators Of The Examinations; To Provide That A Member Of The Board Shall Not Receive Any Per Diem Compensation For Any Day That The Member Is Present At The Site Where The Examinations Are Being Administered; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Cosmetology; may administer student tests.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28 Approved by Governor
2019-03-21HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-21SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-13HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-11HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-11HouseAmended
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2019-02-14SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-12SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-12SenateAmended
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2766.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2766IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2766PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2766SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2766_S_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2766_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2766_H_Amend_01_to_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0360016.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0630008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0710031.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback