MS SB2759 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "mississippi Opioid Crisis Commission" To Review Recommendations By The Governor, Health Care Providers And Appropriate Regulatory Agencies Relative To Opioid Issues And To Develop A Comprehensive Consensus Approach With Legislative And/or Regulatory Recommendations; To Provide That The Commission Shall Convene Beginning May 1, 2018, To Conduct Hearings And Develop Its Initial Report And Shall Update Its Recommendations On An Annual Basis; To Prescribe The Composition Of The Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Opioid Crisis Commission"; establish to develop comprehensive solution to opioid issues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | Died In Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP |
2018-02-20 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |