MS SB2742 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-3-24, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Rating Bureau To Formalize Standards For Awarding Credits To Fire Departments For Certain Fire Equipment For Use In Determining Fire Ratings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Rating Bureau; shall publish guidelines for the grading of fire trucks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-27 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-17 | Conferees Named Robinson,Jones (111th),Gipson | |
2011-03-16 | Conferees Named Clarke,Watson,Lee (35th) | |
2011-03-15 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-02 | Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Insurance | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-07 | Passed | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Insurance |