MS SB2734 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-1-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Human Services To Contract With Vendors To Improve The Performance And Efficiency Of The Child Support Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child support program; authorize Department of Human Services to contract to improve performance and efficiency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-06 | House | Read the Third Time |
2013-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To S.C. Accountblty/Efficiency/Transparency |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Amendment Failed |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |