MS SB2734 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 41-9-51, 41-59-3, 41-59-5, 41-59-7, 41-59-75, 27-19-43 And 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Amend Section 9 Of Chapter 549, Laws Of 2008, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Emergency Medical Services And Trauma Care Services Fee Program; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-59-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Use Of Fees For The Exclusive Benefit Of The Statewide Trauma System; To Amend Reenacted Section 41-59-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add The Trade Association For Ambulance Service Providers To The Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council Within The Department Of Health; To Amend Section 43-11-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On Certain Hospice And Nursing Home Regulations; To Reenact And Amend Section 63-17-171, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Levies A Point-of-sale Fee On Retail Sales Of All-terrain Vehicles And Motorcycles For Deposit Into The Mississippi Trauma Care Systems Fund; To Levy A Fee On Any Resident Of This State Who Purchases A New And Not Previously Registered Motorcycle In Another State And Brings The Motorcycle Into This State; To Provide That The Person Shall Pay The Fee To The Tax Collector At The Time Of Registering The Motorcycle And Applying For A License Tag; To Provide That The Proceeds Of The Fee Shall Be Deposited Into The Mississippi Trauma Care Systems Fund; To Levy A Fee On Any Resident Of This State Who Purchases A New All-terrain Vehicle In Another State And Brings The Vehicle Into This State; To Provide That The Proceeds Of The Fee Shall Be Deposited Into The Mississippi Trauma Care Systems Fund; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Trauma care services fee program; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-28 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-26 | Conference Report Filed | |
2011-03-22 | Conferees Named Holland,Currie,Broomfield | |
2011-03-18 | Conferees Named Bryan,Dearing,Hyde-Smith | |
2011-03-14 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2011-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2011-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2011-02-14 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2011-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-08 | Passed | |
2011-01-27 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |