MS SB2728 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 1, Chapter 557, Laws Of 2009, To Revise The Purposes For Which The Proceeds Of Bonds Authorized To Be Issued For The Gulf Coast Campuses Of The University Of Southern Mississippi May Be Used; To Extend Until July 1, 2015, The Authority To Issue State General Obligation Bonds For Certain Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bonds; revise purposes for which proceeds of bonds for USM/Gulf Coast Campuses may be used.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |