MS SB2724 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Exempt The Department Of Public Safety Building Project And Contract From Certain Public Purchasing Requirements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Public Safety building project and contract; exempt from certain public purchasing requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amended |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |