MS SB2720 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-78, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Use Of A Haul Seine Net For The Taking Of Fish In Marine Waters Within One-half Mile Of The Shoreline Of Cat Island; To Provide The Definition For The Phrase "like Contrivances"; To Exempt Cast Nets, Brill Nets And Hand Seines; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Haul Seine net; prohibit use of for taking of certain fish within one-half mile of the shoreline of Cat Island.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2020-06-17 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-16 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-16 | House | Amended |
2020-06-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |