MS SB2706 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 21-5-23, 21-8-7 And 21-15-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Change The Date Upon Which Elected Municipal Officers Take Office From The First Monday In July To The First Day In July That Does Not Occur On A Weekend; To Amend Sections 21-5-13 And 21-8-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipalities; change the date upon which elected municipal officers take office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-02 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Municipalities | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Municipalities |