MS SB2694 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Veto Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Business and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Veto Referred To Business and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Business and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 73-4-1 Through 73-4-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Mississippi Auctioneers License Act; To Amend Section 73-4-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Repealer On The Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Auctioneers License Act; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | Senate | Veto Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
2013-03-20 | Vetoed | |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |