MS SB2688 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on February 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-25 - Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Certain Sums To The Budget Contingency Fund During Fiscal Year 2010 For The Purpose Of Providing Funds To Restore A Portion Of The Budget Cuts Made To Certain Agencies During Fiscal Year 2010; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer Specified Sums To Certain Agencies From The Amount Transferred To The Budget Contingency Fund; To Authorize The Agencies To Which The Funds Are Transferred To Escalate Their Budgets And Expend Those Funds For The Purposes Authorized By Law, Subject To Certain Conditions; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer A Certain Sum To The School District Emergency Assistance Fund And To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Escalate The Appropriate Budget By That Amount And Expend That Sum For The Purposes Authorized By Law, Subject To Certain Conditions; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State funds; transfer certain sums to BCF to restore portion of FY10 budget cuts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate Veto Sustained (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 26 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-18 - Senate - Senate Decline Concur/Inv Conf Lost (Y: 22 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 106 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Reconsidered (Y: 24 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-05 - Senate - Senate Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost (Y: 24 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-25 Veto Sustained
2010-02-24 Vetoed
2010-02-23 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-02-19 Enrolled Bill Signed
2010-02-18 Concurred in Amend From House
2010-02-18 Decline Concur/Inv Conf Lost
2010-02-15 Returned For Concurrence
2010-02-15 Motion to Reconsider Tabled
2010-02-11 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-02-11 Passed As Amended
2010-02-11 Amended
2010-02-10 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2010-02-10 Referred To Appropriations
2010-02-09 Transmitted To House
2010-02-05 Passed As Amended
2010-02-05 Amended
2010-02-05 Reconsidered
2010-02-05 Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost
2010-02-04 Motion to Reconsider Entered
2010-02-04 Passed As Amended
2010-02-04 Amended
2010-02-04 Committee Substitute Adopted
2010-01-26 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2010-01-18 Referred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/history/SB/SB2688.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2688IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2688CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2688PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2010/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2688SG.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0310002.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0320004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0320005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0320007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/house/0380005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0450005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0450006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2010/pdf/votes/senate/0520003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback