MS SB2682 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-33-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Any Legal Entity Authorized To Exist Under Mississippi Law To Enter Into And Exchange Reciprocal Contracts; To Amend Section 83-33-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Attorney To Be A Limited Liability Company; To Amend Section 83-33-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Declaration Shall Set Forth The Name And Principal Office Address Of The Reciprocal And The Name And Principal Office Address Of The Attorney In Fact Of The Reciprocal; To Reduce The Number Of Separate Risks Required From 75 To 10; To Amend Section 83-33-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Reciprocal May Sue Or Be Sued In Its Own Name; To Prohibit Subscribers From Being Sued; To Amend Section 83-33-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Surplus And Reserve Requirements For A Reciprocal Are The Same As A Stock Company; To Amend Section 83-33-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Reciprocal Must File The Required Annual Statement; To Amend Section 83-33-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Term Commissioner Of Insurance; To Amend Section 83-33-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Insurance License Will Be Held By The Reciprocal And Not The Attorney In Fact; To Amend Section 83-33-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify That The Reciprocal Must Pay The Tax On Premium Receipts; To Create New Section 83-33-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Every Subscriber May Execute A Subscriber's Agreement And Power Of Attorney; To Provide That If A Domestic Reciprocal Requires Execution Then The Subscriber Is Bound By The Executed Agreement; To Provide That If The Domestic Reciprocal Does Not Require Execution, Then The Subscriber Is Bound By The Agreement Approved By The Commissioner Of Insurance; To Create New Section 83-33-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For A Board Of Directors To Govern A Reciprocal; To Create New Section 83-33-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Reciprocals To Return To Its Subscribers Any Savings Or Credits Accruing To Their Accounts; To Create New Section 83-33-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Domestic Reciprocal May Apply For And Shall Receive A Certificate Of Nonassessability Allowing It To Issue Nonassessable Policies If It Has And Maintains A Minimum Surplus At Least Equal To The Minimum Capital And Surplus Required Of A Domestic Stock Insurer; To Create New Section 83-33-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Domestic Reciprocals That Have Not Been Issued A Certificate Allowing For The Issuance Of Nonassessable Policies From Issuing Such Policies; To Provide The Contingent Assessment Liability Requirements; To Create New Section 83-33-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Requirements For Computation And Timing Of Assessments; To Create New Section 83-33-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Subscribers Are Not Personally Liable For The Payment Of A Reciprocal's Debts Or Obligations; To Create New Section 83-33-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Licensing Requirements Of Employees And Agents Of A Reciprocal And Its Attorney; To Create New Section 83-33-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow Two Or More Reciprocals To Combine Into One Reciprocal If Approved By The Commissioner Of Insurance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Reciprocal Insurance Laws; revise.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Reconsidered |
2013-02-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Chism, Buck (5th)) |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |