MS SB2656 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-22.36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend Until July 1, 2016, The Date Of Repeal On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes A Job Tax Credit For Each Full-time Employee Employed In A New Cut And Sew Job By Enterprises That Own Or Operate An Upholstered Household Furniture Manufacturing Facility; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repeal date on job tax credit for cut and sew jobs in the upholstered furniture industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Adams Collins [R] | Sen. Nickey Browning [R] | Sen. Hob Bryan [D] | Sen. Russell Jolly [D] |
Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-10 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-04 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2012-03-13 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-12 | Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Finance |