MS SB2651 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17-2-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Building Code Council To Submit A Report To The Legislature With Recommendations For A Statewide Mandatory Building Code; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Building Code Council; shall furnish report to the Legislature on standards for a statewide building code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-22 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-21 | Passed | |
2012-03-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Insurance | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Insurance |