MS SB2648 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 53-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The State Oil And Gas Board, Instead Of The Mississippi Commission On Environmental Quality, Shall Have Jurisdiction And Authority To Enforce The Provisions Of The Mississippi Geologic Sequestration Of Carbon Dioxide Act; To Provide That The Board Shall Serve As The Permitting Agency For Class Vi Underground Injection Control Wells And Is Authorized To Promulgate Such Rules And Regulations As Are Necessary For The Development And Administration Of The Class Vi Underground Injection Control Well Program; To Amend Sections 53-11-5, 53-11-7 And 53-11-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Geologic Sequestration of Carbon Dioxide Act; Oil and Gas Board shall have jurisdiction to enforce provisions of.
Sponsors
Sen. Joel Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-12 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Energy |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-28 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EN To AC |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 11 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |