MS SB2638 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 89-3-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Recording Procedure For Electronic Documents In Counties That Do Not Have Electronic Capability; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Electronic documents; provide recording procedure for counties without electronic-recording capability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Aguirre,Reynolds |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,McCaughn,Turner-Ford |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |