MS SB2618 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-37-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Concealed Carry Of Weapons; To Bring Forward Section 45-9-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Concealed Carry Of Weapons; To Bring Forward Section 45-9-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Concealed Carry Of Weapons; To Bring Forward Section 45-9-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Concealed Carry Of Weapons; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Concealed weapon; authorize carrying of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |