MS SB2600 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-55-7, 27-55-507, 27-57-7 And 27-59-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Upper Limit On Surety Bonds For Distributors Of Gasoline, Special Fuel, Lubricating Oil And Compressed Gas To Be Exceeded In Certain Circumstances; To Amend Sections 27-57-5, 27-57-9, 27-57-11 And 27-57-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove All References To Class A And Class B Lubricating Oil Distributors; To Amend Sections 27-55-13, 27-55-523, 27-57-13, 27-59-13 And 27-59-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove References To Filing Paper Returns And To Add Requirements For Electronic Filing; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Oil and gas distributors; allow bonds to exceed limit in certain instances, remove class distinctions and require e-filing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |