MS SB2594 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Entitled The "mississippi Student Safety Act"; To Prevent And Reduce The Use Of Certain Student Restraint And Seclusion Procedures In Public And Private Schools; To Provide Definitions; To Provide Minimum Standards To Prohibit School Personnel From Certain Actions; To Provide Standards For Use Of Exclusion Time-out; To Provide For A State Plan And To Provide Reporting Requirements; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Student Safety Act"; prevent certain student restraint and seclusion procedures in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2014-03-11 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2014-03-04 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-17 | House | Referred To Education |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Education |