MS SB2583 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer And Convey Certain Real Property Located In The City Of Hattiesburg, Mississippi, To The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hattiesburg State Service Center property; authorize DFA to transfer a certain parcel of to the Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-04 | House | Died In Committee |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |