MS SB2557 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-15-5, 73-15-20 And 83-41-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Automatic Reverter And Repealer On Those Statutes Which Delete The Requirement That Certain Regulations Relating To The Practice Of Nursing Shall Be Jointly Promulgated By The State Board Of Nursing And The State Board Of Medical Licensure, Define The Term "advance Practice Registered Nurse" For The Purposes Of The Nursing Practice Law, Prescribe The Qualifications For The Licensure Of Advance Practice Registered Nurses, Prescribe The Practice Requirements For Advance Practice Registered Nurses, And Delete The Requirement That Certified Nurse Practitioners Shall Be Under The Supervision Of A Licensed Physician For Insurance Reimbursement Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Certified nurse practitioner requirement for supervision by a licensed physician for insurance reimbursement; delete reverter.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-05 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-03 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-02 | Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-18 | Rereferred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Insurance | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-11 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |