MS SB2555 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-15-51, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Limited Immunity From Civil Liability To Child Advocacy Centers And Multidisciplinary Team Members; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Child advocacy centers; immunity from civil liability.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Dennis DeBar [R] | Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Melanie Sojourner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |