MS SB2552 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 99-15-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Persons Charged With Crimes Of Fraud Or Embezzlement Exceeding A Certain Amount Are Not Eligible For Pretrial Intervention; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pretrial Intervention Program; prohibit eligibility for persons charged with public embezzlement over a certain amount.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Jeremy England [R] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] | Sen. Michael McLendon [R] |
Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] | Sen. Tyler McCaughn [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed |
2021-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |