MS SB2546 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-7-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Revenue To Revise The Individual Income Tax Forms Used For Returns To Allow An Individual Taxpayer To Designate Up To Two Bank Accounts For Direct Deposit Of The Taxpayer's Refund And The Allocation Of The Taxpayer's Refund Amount Between The Designated Bank Accounts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dept. of Revenue; authorize to revise individual income tax forms to allow designation of two bank accounts for direct deposit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDP: WM To BB |
2020-05-27 | House | DR - TSDP: BB To WM |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services;Ways and Means |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: FI To BF |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance;Business and Financial Institutions |