MS SB2541 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Composition Of The State And School Employees Health Insurance Management Board By Authorization Of The State Superintendent Of Public Education To Designate An Individual To Serve In His Or Her Capacity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State and School Health Insurance Management Board; authorize superintendent of education to name designee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Education |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To ED |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Education |