MS SB2541 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Provide For Certain Transfers To The Capital Expense Fund During Fiscal Year 2019; To Provide For Certain Transfers From The Capital Expense Fund To The 2018 Transportation And Infrastructure Improvements Fund; To Amend Section 43-13-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Health Care Expendable Fund; To Authorize The Escalation Of Funds For The Variable Compensation Plan Or Pay Increases For Specified Agencies; To Amend Sections 2 And 3, Chapter 57, Laws Of 2018, Which Provides For The Payment Of Debt; To Amend Section 3, Chapter 99, Laws Of 2018, Which Transfers Certain Amounts In The Fiscal Year 2018 Appropriation To The Department Of Public Safety Among Various Categories; And To Transfer Funds To The Mississippi Forestry Commission Operating Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget process; bring forward various sections relating to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Read,Cockerham,Huddleston
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Simmons (13th)
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-07HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-02-27HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback