MS SB2536 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 21-15-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Service Limitation Period For Municipal Appointees Serving In An Interim Or Hold-over Capacity; To Provide That The Service Limitation Shall Apply Retroactively To Such Appointees Serving On The Effective Date Of This Act; To Amend Section 21-8-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Municipal appointments; clarify service limitation period for certain hold-over and interim appointments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Municipalities |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Municipalities |