MS SB2533 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-59-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define The Terms "active Licensee" And "inactive Licensee" In Relation To The Residential Builders And Remodelers Act; To Amend Section 73-59-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State Board Of Contractors To Require Liability Insurance Before Obtaining A License; To Amend Section 73-59-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Exemptions From The Residential Builders And Remodelers Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Residential Builders and Remodelers Act; revise license requirements and exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-04-05 | Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2012-03-12 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-03-08 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-03-08 | Amended | |
2012-03-08 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-03-05 | DR - TSDPCS: BF To HO | |
2012-02-29 | DR - TSDPCS: HO To BF | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Housing;Business and Financial Institutions |