MS SB2531 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Emergency Communications Authority Act; To Define Certain Terms Used In The Act; To Establish The Mississippi Emergency Communications Authority As An Entity Within The Mississippi Emergency Management Agency; To Provide For The Authority's Powers And Duties; To Provide For Confidentiality Of Information Submitted To The Authority; To Bring Forward Section 33-15-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 33-15-14, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Repeal Section 19-5-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Emergency Telephone Service Charges; To Repeal Section 19-5-331, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines Certain Terms As Used In The Provisions Providing For Enhanced Wireless Emergency Telephone Service; To Repeal Section 19-5-333, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Creates The Commercial Mobile Radio Service (cmrs) Board And Provides For Its Powers And Duties; To Repeal Section 19-5-335, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Collection Of Service Charges By The Commercial Mobile Radio Service Board And Requires Registration Of Cmrs Providers; To Repeal Section 19-5-337, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Confidentiality Of Proprietary Information Submitted To The Commercial Mobile Radio Service Board; To Repeal Section 19-5-339, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Requirement To Provide Enhanced 911 Service; To Repeal Section 19-5-341, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Makes It An Offense And Provides Criminal Penalties For Using Wireless Emergency Telephone Service For Personal Use; To Repeal Section 19-5-343, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Collection And Remittance Of Prepaid Wireless E911 Charges; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Emergency Communications Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Technology |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 5 | 313 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 331 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 333 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 335 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 337 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 339 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 341 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 5 | 343 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 15 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |