MS SB2526 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 51-15-103, 51-15-107, 51-15-109, 51-15-113, 51-15-115, 51-15-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Municipalities Located In Counties That Are Not Members Of The Pat Harrison Waterway District To Join The District; To Amend Section 51-15-118, To Authorize The Governing Authorities Of A Member Municipality To Withdraw The Municipality From The District; To Amend Sections 51-15-119, 51-15-131, 51-15-133, 51-15-136, 51-15-139 And 51-15-158, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; To Bring Forward Sections 51-15-105 And 51-15-129, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pat Harrison Waterway District; authorize municipalities to join.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - House - House Passed (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-02-22 | House | Passed |
2023-02-21 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred To Municipalities |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
51 | 15 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 117 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 119 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 129 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 136 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 139 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 15 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |