MS SB2514 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish And Prescribe Responsibilities For The Mississippi Advisory Council On Faith-based Initiatives Within The Office Of The Governor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Advisory Council on Faith-Based Initiatives; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 28 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2017-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Ethics |