MS SB2508 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-04 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Section 73-25-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides That Every Person Who Receives A License To Practice Medicine Must File It In The Office Of The Clerk Of The Circuit Court Of The County In Which He Resides Or Practices Within 60 Days; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Physician's license to practice; filing with circuit clerk not required.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-04 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Wooten, Mims, Johnson (87th)) |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-17 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |