MS SB2493 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Supporting And Strengthening Families Act; To Create New Section 93-31-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Short Title; To Create New Section 93-31-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Temporary Power Of Attorney To Provide For Delegation By A Parent Or Guardian Of The Authority Of Care And Custody Of A Child And To Enact A Time Limit, Exceptions To The Power, And For Rescinding The Power Of Attorney; To Create New Section 93-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify A Form And Minimum Requirements For The Power Of Attorney; To Create New Section 93-31-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Attorneys-in-fact From Certain Licensure Requirements; To Amend Sections 43-15-111 And 43-16-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 43-21-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Certain Information Be Provided To Parents And Guardians In Unsubstantiated Cases; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Supporting and Strengthening Families Act; create.
Sponsors
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Billy Hudson [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 42 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-17 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Touchstone,Clark |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Conferees Named Tindell,Parker,Branning |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-29 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-29 | House | Amended |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-16 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |