MS SB2484 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-43-53, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Criminal Penalty For Embezzlement Or Theft Of Perpetual Care Trust Funds; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Perpetual cemeteries; create offense of embezzlement, misapplication or conversion of trust funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-28 | House | Passed |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |